Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Crotty

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1769²Born
1792²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
22 Mar 183364.2AppointedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
11 Jun 183364.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
3 Oct 184677.7DiedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Crotty (VIAF: 315636685)
Bishop Bartholomew Crotty (born 1769, died ) Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClonakilty

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 154
  • op/opd: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 22
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast