Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Donnelly

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1823Born
6 Jun 184623.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 186541.9AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
26 Feb 186542.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
29 Dec 189370.9DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Donnelly (VIAF: 315679972)
Bishop James Donnelly (born , died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScotstown
Ordained BishopMonaghan, Diocese of Clogher
Buried Place (Current)St. Macartan's, Cathedral, Monaghan, Diocese of Clogher

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017