Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Finnegan

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1837Born
1 Sep 186124.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 188648.7AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
13 Jun 188648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
11 Nov 188750.2DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Finnegan
Bishop Bernard Finnegan (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorlurgon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cavan

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,886, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast