Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Naughten

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1835Born
2 Sep 187944.2AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
4 Jan 188044.6Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
4 Jul 190065.1DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Michael Naughten
Bishop Michael Naughten (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiden, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopMullingar

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017