Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosius Jacobus Johannes van Baars, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Teuchira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1854Born
15 Aug 187925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Feb 189742.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
15 Feb 189742.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Teuchira
23 May 189743.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teuchira
25 Mar 191055.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Ambrosius Jacobus Johannes van Baars (VIAF: 290615845)
Bishop Ambrosius Jacobus Johannes van Baars O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curaçao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTiel, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands
Ordained BishopPort of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017