Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Higgins

Deceased

Bishop of Ballarat, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1838Born
29 May 186325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
11 Sep 188850.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
11 Sep 188850.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
31 Mar 188951.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
4 May 189961.3AppointedBishop of Rockhampton, Australia
3 Mar 190567.1AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
16 Sep 191577.6DiedBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph Higgins
Bishop Joseph Higgins (born , died ) Bishop of Ballarat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoyvore, Diocese of Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Navan, Diocese of Meath, Ireland

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111, and Page 484
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018