Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Tohill

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1855BornGortnacrane
1878¹22.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 190852.5AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
20 Sep 190852.7Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
4 Jul 191458.5DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Tohill:
Bishop John Tohill (born , died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013