Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip James Anthony Kennedy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Adelaide

Titular Bishop of Ros Cré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1930BornMount Gambier
30 Jun 196231.9Ordained PriestPriest of Adelaide, Australia
29 Jan 197342.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adelaide, Australia
29 Jan 197342.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
17 Mar 197342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
23 Mar 198352.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Philip James Anthony Kennedy:
Bishop Philip James Anthony Kennedy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Adelaide

  • a priest for 20.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013