Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick O’Loughlin, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Darwin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1911BornBrompton
30 Nov 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Jan 194937.5AppointedBishop of Darwin, Australia
20 Apr 194937.7Ordained BishopBishop of Darwin, Australia
22 May 194937.8InstalledBishop of Darwin, Australia
14 Nov 198574.3DiedBishop of Darwin, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Patrick O’Loughlin:
Bishop John Patrick O’Loughlin M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Darwin

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013