Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-Joseph Viard, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wellington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1809BornLyons, France
20 Dec 183425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
7 Feb 184535.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Zealand
7 Feb 184535.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
4 Jan 184636.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
20 Jun 184838.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wellington, New Zealand
3 Jul 186050.7AppointedBishop of Wellington, New Zealand
2 Jun 187262.6DiedBishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Philippe-Joseph Viard:
Bishop Philippe-Joseph Viard S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Wellington

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 597
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 20 Sep 2013