Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Maria Bataillon, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Oceania, Tonga

Titular Bishop of Aenus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1810BornSaint-Cyr-les-Vignes, France
19 Dec 183526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
23 Aug 184232.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
23 Aug 184232.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
3 Dec 184333.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
186353.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
11 Apr 187767.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Oceania, Tonga

MicroData Summary for Pierre Maria Bataillon:
Bishop Pierre Maria Bataillon S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Oceania

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 20 Sep 2013