Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloys Elloy, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania

Apostolic Administrator of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1829Born
19 Jun 185323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
11 Aug 186333.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
11 Aug 186333.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
30 Nov 186435.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
187040.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
11 Apr 187747.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
22 Nov 187848.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga

MicroData Summary for Aloys Elloy (VIAF: 107024787)
Bishop Aloys Elloy S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceServigny-les-Raville, France

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017