Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Marie Douarre, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina

Member of Society of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1810BornJob, France
Jun 1834³23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
23 Aug 184231.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
23 Aug 184231.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
8 Sep 184231.7ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
18 Oct 184231.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
13 Jul 184736.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Aug 185039.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)
27 Jun 185342.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}, American Samoa, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Marie Douarre (VIAF: 316447614)
Bishop Guillaume Marie Douarre S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Archipelago of the Navigators {Arcipelago dei Navigatori}

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 70
  • ab: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016