Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Georges Collomb, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Antiphellus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1816Born
25 May 183923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
13 Feb 184629.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)
13 Feb 184629.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
23 May 184731.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
16 Jul 184832.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Jean Georges Collomb
Bishop Jean Georges Collomb S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Melanesia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranier, France

  • a priest for 9.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018