Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Dalmazio Cardinal Minoretti

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1861BornCogliate San Dalmazio
1883¹21.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Dec 191554.2AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
16 Jan 191654.3Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
16 Jan 192563.3AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
16 Dec 192968.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 192968.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
13 Mar 193876.5DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Dalmazio Minoretti:
Cardinal Carlo Dalmazio Minoretti (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 145
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013