Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Luzi

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1813Born
20 May 183723.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185845.0AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
27 Mar 185945.2Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
9 Jan 187662.0DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Luzi (VIAF: 89192293)
Bishop Giacinto Luzi (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComunanza, Diocese of Montalto (delle Marche)
Ordained BishopSs. Vincent et Anastase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,859, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast