Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Bonello, O.F.M.

Bishop of Juticalpa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1961 BornXaghra, Malta
28 Aug 198322.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 198423.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jul 198524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Nov 201049.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Juticalpa, Honduras
12 Feb 201149.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Juticalpa, Honduras
2 Feb 201250.8SucceededBishop of Juticalpa, Honduras

MicroData Summary for José Bonello:
Bishop José Bonello O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Juticalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Juticalpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,950
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013