Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
1 Nov 1963 | Born | ||
5 Jul 1991 | 27.6 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Malta |
5 Apr 2024 | 60.4 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile |
5 Apr 2024 | 60.4 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of La Imperial |
(WikiData: Q125352326)
Father
Henry Joseph
Balzan
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop-Elect
of La Serena
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Ħamrun, Archdiocese of Malta |
Ordained Priest | Malta, Archdiocese of Malta |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of La Serena.
|
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 19 Apr 2024 |
✠