Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Lee

Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1941 BornNewport
19 Jun 196624.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 199351.5AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
25 Jul 199351.6Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
1 Oct 201371.8ResignedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Lee:
Bishop William Lee (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Waterford and Lismore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,121
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Oct 2013