Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Russell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1920BornLoughmore
17 Jun 194524.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 196544.9AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
19 Dec 196545.0Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
27 May 199372.4RetiredBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
12 Jan 200988.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Russell:
Bishop Michael Russell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015