Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Joseph Henderson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Trecalae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1924Born
6 Jun 194824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
12 Oct 197248.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
12 Oct 197248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Trecalae
8 Dec 197248.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trecalae
26 Jan 200176.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
10 Apr 200681.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph Henderson
Bishop Charles Joseph Henderson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford, County Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. John, College, Waterford, County Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Death PlacePark House, Blackheath Village, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast