Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James McLoughlin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1929BornGalway
20 Jun 195425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
10 Feb 199363.8AppointedBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
28 Mar 199364.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
23 May 200576.1RetiredBishop of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland
25 Nov 200576.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James McLoughlin:
Bishop James McLoughlin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galway and Kilmacduagh

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,009
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013