Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Gregorio Nava Rojas

Bishop of Machiques, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1963 Born
22 Jul 198925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cabimas, Venezuela
19 Oct 201955.8AppointedBishop of Machiques, Venezuela
14 Dec 201956.0Ordained BishopBishop of Machiques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Gregorio Nava Rojas
Bishop Nicolás Gregorio Nava Rojas (born ) Bishop of Machiques

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaracaibo, Diocese of Maracaibo
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Cathedral, Machiques, Diocese of Machiques

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Machiques.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Oct 2019
  • c34: CB, 24 Nov 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast