Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pío Bello Ricardo, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Los Teques


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1921BornGuarenas
30 Jul 195130.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 May 197756.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Los Teques, Venezuela
23 May 197756.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
10 Jul 197756.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca Terebenthina
31 Jan 198159.7AppointedBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela
2 Dec 199574.6RetiredBishop of Los Teques, Venezuela
27 Jul 200382.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Los Teques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Pío Bello Ricardo:
Bishop Pío Bello Ricardo S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Los Teques

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013