Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Mariani

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Greece

Titular Archbishop of Missua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1919Born
21 Mar 194222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
16 Oct 196748.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Missua
16 Oct 196748.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sénégal
16 Oct 196748.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Western Africa
3 Dec 196748.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Missua
20 Sep 197152.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Niger
24 Mar 197252.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Dahomey
19 Jun 197253.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
1973²53.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Dahomey
17 Oct 197354.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mali and Mauritania
11 Jan 197555.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
Jan 197858.5AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
25 Apr 198060.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Greece
5 May 199070.8ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Greece
23 Jan 199171.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mariani
(WikiData: Q17321960)
Archbishop Giovanni Mariani (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Greece

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVicosoprano, Santo Stefano d'Aveto, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
Ordained PriestBobbio, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
Ordained BishopCollège de la Propagande, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceOspedale Galliera, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Vicosoprano, Rezzoaglio, Diocese of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • bpd: AM, 30 Aug 2021
  • opd: AM, 2 Sep 2021
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Apr 2023
  • buro.loc: AM, 8 Feb 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 9 Feb 2024