Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Nunciature to Dahomey | |||
29 June 1971 | Established | Delegation to Western Africa | Nunciature to Dahomey |
1 May 1973 | Territory Added | Nunciature to Dahomey (from Dacaria) | |
Nunciature to Benin | |||
27 December 1975 | Name Changed | Nunciature to Dahomey | Nunciature to Benin |
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 24 Jun 2023 |
✠