Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael August Blume, S.V.D.

Apostolic Nuncio to Uganda

Titular Archbishop of Alexanum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1946 BornSouth Bend, IN, USA
23 Dec 197226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
24 Aug 200559.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alexanum
24 Aug 200559.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
24 Aug 200559.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
30 Sep 200559.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Alexanum
2 Feb 201366.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uganda

MicroData Summary for Michael August Blume:
Archbishop Michael August Blume S.V.D. (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Uganda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Uganda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • ob: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,981
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 13 Mar 2014