Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Nguyn Van Tot

Apostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka

Titular Archbishop of Rusticiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1949 Born
24 Mar 197424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
25 Nov 200253.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rusticiana
25 Nov 200253.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
25 Nov 200253.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
6 Jan 200353.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rusticiana
24 Aug 200556.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Central African Republic
24 Aug 200556.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chad
13 May 200859.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
22 Mar 201464.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyn Van Tot
Archbishop Pierre Nguyn Van Tot (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Sri Lanka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThu dau mot

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Sri Lanka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/up: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,302
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast