Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Pierre Louis Dupuy

Apostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Selsea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1940 BornSoustons, France
8 Jul 197232.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 199353.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selsea
6 Apr 199353.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ghana
6 Apr 199353.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
6 Apr 199353.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
6 Jun 199353.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Selsea
27 Nov 199959.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
27 Mar 200060.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
24 Feb 200565.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to European Community
11 Jul 200666.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Monaco
15 Dec 201171.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for André Pierre Louis Dupuy:
Archbishop André Pierre Louis Dupuy (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Netherlands

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Netherlands.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,076
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013