Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Abadamloora

Deceased

Bishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1938Born
3 Aug 196829.6Ordained PriestPriest of Navrongo, Ghana
14 Mar 199455.2AppointedBishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana
29 Jun 199455.5Ordained BishopBishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana
23 Dec 200971.0DiedBishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Lucas Abadamloora (VIAF: 6418099)
Bishop Lucas Abadamloora (born , died ) Bishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiana
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame des Sept Douleurs, Cathedral, Navrongo, Diocese of Navrongo-Bolgatanga

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,428
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast