Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolph A. Akanlu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1922Born
27 May 195027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Navrongo, Ghana
16 Nov 197250.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Navrongo, Ghana
16 Nov 197250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
31 Mar 197350.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fallaba
13 Apr 197350.5SucceededBishop of Navrongo, Ghana
14 Mar 199471.4RetiredBishop of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana
7 Jul 200178.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Navrongo-Bolgatanga, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Rudolph A. Akanlu
Bishop Rudolph A. Akanlu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Navrongo-Bolgatanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKolo

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018