Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Kwasi Gyamfi

Bishop of Sunyani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1957 BornWamanafo
27 Jul 198527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sunyani, Ghana
14 Apr 200345.6AppointedBishop of Sunyani, Ghana
28 Jun 200345.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sunyani, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Matthew Kwasi Gyamfi:
Bishop Matthew Kwasi Gyamfi (born ) Bishop of Sunyani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sunyani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015