Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthias Kobena Nketsiah

Archbishop of Cape Coast


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1942 BornKakomdo
19 Jul 197028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Coast, Ghana
24 Nov 200664.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
24 Nov 200664.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
3 Feb 200764.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira
31 May 201068.1AppointedArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
24 Jul 201068.2InstalledArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
14 Dec 201169.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
13 Sep 201472.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Matthias Kobena Nketsiah
Archbishop Matthias Kobena Nketsiah (born ) Archbishop of Cape Coast

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cape Coast.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,332
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016