Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Patili Assi

Deceased

Bishop of Kara, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1936Born
28 Jun 196427.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 199457.5AppointedBishop of Kara, Togo
15 Oct 199457.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kara, Togo
16 Feb 199659.1DiedBishop of Kara, Togo

MicroData Summary for Ernest Patili Assi
Bishop Ernest Patili Assi (born , died ) Bishop of Kara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBohou

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,443
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018