Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Sergio Godoy

Deceased

Bishop of Maracaibo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1881BornBejuma
18 Mar 190523.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 192038.4AppointedBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
16 May 192038.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
21 Oct 195776.0DiedBishop of Maracaibo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Marcos Sergio Godoy:
Bishop Marcos Sergio Godoy (born , died ) Bishop of Maracaibo

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013