Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Turrado Moreno, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Assus

Titular See: (Gaspar de Pinilla)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1903Born
25 May 192925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Sep 194440.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
4 Sep 194440.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Assus
17 Dec 194440.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assus
Jan 195450.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
16 Nov 196157.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Turrado Moreno
Bishop 聲gel Turrado Moreno O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques

EventPlace
Birth PlacePinilla, Spain

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations 夗iscopales, Issue 1944, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018