Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino Gómez Villa, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní

Titular Bishop of Cucusus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1891BornLa Aldea del Puente, Spain
8 Apr 191624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Jul 193847.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
14 Jul 193847.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
18 Dec 193847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cucusus
11 Oct 196776.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
22 Mar 198189.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Constantino Gómez Villa:
Bishop Constantino Gómez Villa O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Caroní

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015