Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Gutiérrez Salazar, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Caroní

Titular Bishop of Bamaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1913BornVillacidayo, Spain
9 Jun 193623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Mar 196854.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
11 Mar 196854.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
28 Jul 196855.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
23 Oct 199582.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mariano Gutiérrez Salazar:
Bishop Mariano Gutiérrez Salazar O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Caroní

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013