Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Adam Dalmau

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1893Born
23 Dec 191623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
29 Aug 193743.7AppointedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
31 Oct 193743.9Ordained BishopBishop of Valencia en Venezuela
12 Jul 196167.6DiedBishop of Valencia en Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Adam Dalmau
Bishop Gregorio Adam Dalmau (born , died ) Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018