Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Saturnino Aurrecoechea Palacios, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques

Titular Bishop of Doliche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1904BornVillaverde, Spain
6 Jun 193632.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Dec 195551.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
19 Dec 195551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
27 May 195652.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
10 Mar 198682.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Machiques, Venezuela
8 Sep 199793.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Miguel Saturnino Aurrecoechea Palacios:
Bishop Miguel Saturnino Aurrecoechea Palacios O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Machiques

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015