Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sixto Sosa Díaz

Deceased

Bishop of Cumaná


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1870BornTinaco
22 Dec 189424.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 191544.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guayana, Venezuela
14 Jun 191544.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
31 Oct 191545.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
5 Dec 191848.1AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
16 Jun 192352.7AppointedBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
29 May 194372.6DiedBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Sixto Sosa Díaz:
Bishop Sixto Sosa Díaz (born , died ) Bishop of Cumaná

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013