Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Durán

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1839BornTrujillo
5 Apr 186223.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 189152.7AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
6 Dec 189152.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
18 Jul 191778.5DiedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Durán:
Bishop Antonio María Durán (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013