Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Arroyo y Niño

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1814Born
11 Dec 183622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
19 Aug 183824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
19 Jun 185642.1AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
7 Dec 185642.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
30 Nov 188470.6DiedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Arroyo y Niño (VIAF: 251997956)
Bishop José Manuel Arroyo y Niño (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarora, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017