Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Talavera y Garcés

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guayana

Titular Bishop of Trecalae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1777BornCoro
1801²23.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 182851.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guayana, Venezuela
22 Dec 182851.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Trecalae
15 Aug 182951.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trecalae
1842²64.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Guayana, Venezuela
23 Dec 186184.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guayana, Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Talavera y Garcés (VIAF: 24404629)
Bishop Mariano Talavera y Garcés (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guayana

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 209, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016