Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Caicedo y Flores

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1756Born
21 May 182770.8AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
19 Mar 182871.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
17 Feb 183275.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fernando Caicedo y Flores (VIAF: 29473009)
Archbishop Fernando Caicedo y Flores (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSuaita

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018