Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón J. Lizardi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Assava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1909BornCiudad Bolívar
26 May 193424.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 195646.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
25 May 195646.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
15 Aug 195646.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assava
30 Jul 197262.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ramón J. Lizardi:
Bishop Ramón J. Lizardi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013