Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alfonso Márquez Molina, C.I.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mérida, Venezuela

Titular Bishop of Turris Rotunda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1936 Born
29 Jun 196225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
18 Oct 200164.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
18 Oct 200164.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Rotunda
12 Jan 200265.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Rotunda
15 Jul 201376.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfonso Márquez Molina
Bishop Luis Alfonso Márquez Molina C.I.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTovar

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mérida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,114
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018