Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saúl Figueroa Albornoz

Bishop of Puerto Cabello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1947 BornCaracas
16 Oct 197629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
10 Nov 199750.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
10 Nov 199750.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
10 Jan 199850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
30 Apr 201163.5AppointedBishop of Puerto Cabello, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Saúl Figueroa Albornoz:
Bishop Saúl Figueroa Albornoz (born ) Bishop of Puerto Cabello

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Puerto Cabello.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,190
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013