Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bufi Bocci

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Civitavecchia

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1799BornFoligno
15 Mar 182323.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 183838.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Civitavecchia, Italy
15 Feb 183838.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
25 Feb 183838.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
21 Jul 185050.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bufi Bocci:
Bishop Vincenzo Bufi Bocci (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Civitavecchia

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013