Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eutizio Parsi

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1845Born
22 Jun 189650.6AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
5 Jul 189650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
13 Apr 190660.4DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Eutizio Parsi (VIAF: 304917546)
Bishop Eutizio Parsi (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitavecchia, Diocese of Civitavecchia
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 139
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,896, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast